Assembly | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration refused. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |