Assembly | 06/06/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |