|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6347.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5300.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|