California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB28 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill February 11, 2015