California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016