|
09/21/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6138.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5053.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|