Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |