California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2822 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016