California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016