California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016