|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6445.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 5367.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11). In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5212.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|