California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015