California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016