California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016