California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2868 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016