Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4688.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |