California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016