California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016