Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4944.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Read first time. To print. |