Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 3. Page 5175.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5012.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|