California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2881 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016