California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016