LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2884
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2884
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2884
Compare Versions
AB2884 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB2884 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2884 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2884 Amended June 8, 2016
AB2884 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2884 Introduced February 25, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2884 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB2884 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2884 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2884 Amended June 8, 2016
AB2884 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2884 Introduced February 25, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare