Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Read first time. To print. |