Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|