California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2891 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 29, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016