California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2892 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 29, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016