|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5699.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4647.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|