California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2895 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016