Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|