Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|