Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4961.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 1. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2016 | Read first time. To print. |