California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2899 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016