Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|