Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|