California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2910 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016