|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6359.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5267.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4690.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|