California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016