California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016