07/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 110, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/25/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/11/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.) | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4614.) | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |