|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6302.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5231.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4614.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|