LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB293
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB293
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB293
Compare Versions
AB293 Chaptered August 13, 2015
AB293 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB293 Amended June 25, 2015
AB293 Amended June 1, 2015
AB293 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB293 Chaptered August 13, 2015
AB293 Enrolled July 13, 2015
AB293 Amended June 25, 2015
AB293 Amended June 1, 2015
AB293 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare