California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill June 15, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015