|
08/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1788.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|