LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB302
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB302
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB302
Compare Versions
AB302 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB302 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB302 Amended July 14, 2015
AB302 Amended June 1, 2015
AB302 Amended April 20, 2015
AB302 Amended March 26, 2015
AB302 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB302 Chaptered October 9, 2015
AB302 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB302 Amended July 14, 2015
AB302 Amended June 1, 2015
AB302 Amended April 20, 2015
AB302 Amended March 26, 2015
AB302 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare