California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB303 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015