|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 20. Page 2997.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2593.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|