Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2015 | Read first time. To print. |