Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 15. Page 1539.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2015 | Read first time. To print. |