Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2015 | Read first time. To print. |